NC S53 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Private Alternative Teacher Preparation
Title
Private Alternative Teacher Preparation
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Paul Lowe [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/30/2016 |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-29 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2016 |
2016-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-27 | House | Serial Referral To Regulatory Reform Stricken |
2015-03-16 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Regulatory Reform |
2015-03-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-12 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H44 (Same As) 2015-09-23 - Ch. SL 2015-246