NC S527 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
ABC Omnibus 2023
Title
ABC Omnibus 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-09-12 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2023-09-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2023-09-07 | House | Ruled Material |
2023-09-07 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-06-26 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2023-06-26 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Added |
2023-06-26 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2023-06-21 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-03 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Abc Boards
Abc Comn.
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Advertising & Marketing
Alcoholic Beverages
Ale
Appointments
Beer & Wine
Boards
Building Codes
Buildings
Calendar
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commissions
Communications
Community Colleges
Council Of State
Counties
Crimes
Definitions
Distilleries
Education
Elections
Elevators & Escalators
Entertainment Industry
Ethics
Food Services
Foods & Beverages
General Assembly
Governor
Higher Education
Holidays
Housing
Law Enforcement
Licenses & Permits
Liquor
Local Government
Manufacturing
Membership
Minorities
Mobile & Vehicle-based Businesses
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
President Pro Tempore
Public
Public Officials
Public Safety Dept.
Retailing
Safety
Safety Equipment
Speaker
Sports
Taxation
Title Change
Tribes & Tribal Government
Abc Comn.
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Advertising & Marketing
Alcoholic Beverages
Ale
Appointments
Beer & Wine
Boards
Building Codes
Buildings
Calendar
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commissions
Communications
Community Colleges
Council Of State
Counties
Crimes
Definitions
Distilleries
Education
Elections
Elevators & Escalators
Entertainment Industry
Ethics
Food Services
Foods & Beverages
General Assembly
Governor
Higher Education
Holidays
Housing
Law Enforcement
Licenses & Permits
Liquor
Local Government
Manufacturing
Membership
Minorities
Mobile & Vehicle-based Businesses
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
President Pro Tempore
Public
Public Officials
Public Safety Dept.
Retailing
Safety
Safety Equipment
Speaker
Sports
Taxation
Title Change
Tribes & Tribal Government