NC S512 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Ch. SL 2023-136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Ch. SL 2023-136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Greater Accountability for Boards/Commissions
Title
Greater Accountability for Boards/Commissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-10 - House - Veto Override (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-10-10 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 72 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Senate - Conference Report Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-05-31 - House - A1 Longest Second Reading M3 To Lay On The Table (Y: 73 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-10-10 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 72 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Senate - Conference Report Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-05-31 - House - A1 Longest Second Reading M3 To Lay On The Table (Y: 73 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Ch. SL 2023-136 | |
2023-10-10 | House | Veto Overridden |
2023-10-10 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-10-10 | House | Veto Received from Senate |
2023-10-10 | Senate | Veto Overridden |
2023-10-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/10/2023 |
2023-10-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-08-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-08-24 | Vetoed 08/24/2023 | |
2023-08-18 | Pres. To Gov. 8/18/2023 | |
2023-08-17 | Ratified | |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2023-08-16 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2023-08-16 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-08-16 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2023-06-07 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/06/2023 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2023-06-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-05-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-31 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-31 | House | Amend Tabled A1 |
2023-05-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-05-31 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-05-31 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-31 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-31 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary 1 |
2023-05-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-05-11 | House | Re-ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-10 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Amend Tabled A2 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Boards
Chaptered
Coastal Resources
Coastal Resources Comn.
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commerce Dept.
Commissions
Committees
Council Of State
Economic Development
Economic Investment Comm.
Education
Environment
Environmental Management Comn.
Fish & Wildlife
General Assembly
Governor
Health Services
Higher Education
Membership
Presented
President Pro Tempore
Public
Public Health
Public Health Comn.
Public Officials
Railroad Board
Railroads
Ratified
Speaker
State Treasurer
Transportation
Transportation Board
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Unc Health Care
Utilities
Utilities Comn.
Vacancies
Veto Overridden
Vetoed
Wildlife Resources Comn.
Boards
Chaptered
Coastal Resources
Coastal Resources Comn.
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commerce Dept.
Commissions
Committees
Council Of State
Economic Development
Economic Investment Comm.
Education
Environment
Environmental Management Comn.
Fish & Wildlife
General Assembly
Governor
Health Services
Higher Education
Membership
Presented
President Pro Tempore
Public
Public Health
Public Health Comn.
Public Officials
Railroad Board
Railroads
Ratified
Speaker
State Treasurer
Transportation
Transportation Board
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Unc Health Care
Utilities
Utilities Comn.
Vacancies
Veto Overridden
Vetoed
Wildlife Resources Comn.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
113A | 104 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 31 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 31.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 31.7 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 37 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 121 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 123 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
124 | 15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 241 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 242 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 283 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 284 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 350 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 437.54 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
62 | 10 | (n/a) | Citation Text |