NC S51 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Ch. SL 2021-39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Ch. SL 2021-39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Even-Year Elect Craven Local Gov'ts
Title
Even-Year Elect Craven Local Gov'ts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Ch. SL 2021-39 | |
2021-06-16 | Ratified | |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2021 |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-06-10 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-06-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-09 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Bridgeton
Chaptered
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Cove City
Craven County
Dover
Elections
Gaston County
Havelock
Local
Local Government
Mayors
Municipalities
Public Officials
Ratified
River Bend
Sanitary Districts
Session Laws
Tax Districts
Title Change
Trent Woods
Chaptered
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Cove City
Craven County
Dover
Elections
Gaston County
Havelock
Local
Local Government
Mayors
Municipalities
Public Officials
Ratified
River Bend
Sanitary Districts
Session Laws
Tax Districts
Title Change
Trent Woods
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 279 | (n/a) | Citation Text |