NC S505 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-23 - Ch. SL 2013-347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-23 - Ch. SL 2013-347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify Agricultural Zoning
Title
Clarify Agricultural Zoning
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | Ch. SL 2013-347 | |
2013-07-23 | Signed by Gov. 7/23/2013 | |
2013-07-17 | Pres. To Gov. 07/17/2013 | |
2013-07-16 | Ratified | |
2013-07-15 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/15/2013 |
2013-07-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-07-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Government |
2013-05-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Government |
2013-05-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2013 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Filed |