NC S496 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Ch. SL 2022-46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Ch. SL 2022-46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
DOI Omnibus Bill
Title
DOI Omnibus Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Ch. SL 2022-46 | |
2022-07-07 | Signed by Gov. 7/7/2022 | |
2022-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2022 | |
2022-06-30 | Ratified | |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2022-06-29 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2022-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2022 |
2022-06-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2022-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-28 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2022 |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2022-06-21 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2022 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2022-02-17 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/17/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-02-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-10-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-10-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-08-04 | House | Serial Referral To State Government Stricken |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Authorities
Aviation
Boards
Building Codes
Buildings
Casualty
Chaptered
Commerce
Corporations
Council Of State
Criminal Records
Disasters & Emergencies
Dmv
Education
Education Boards
Employment
For-profit
Global Transpark Authority
Health
Health Services
Hmos
Home Inspector Board
Housing
Inspections
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Liability
Licensing & Certification
Local Government
Long-term Care
Managed Care
Manufactured Homes
Motor Vehicle
Motor Vehicles
Nonprofit
Notification
Occupational Testing
Occupations
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Records
Reinsurance Facility Board
Religion & Religious Institutions
School Buildings
Special Economic Zones
Surety & Fidelity
Testing
Transportation Dept.
Authorities
Aviation
Boards
Building Codes
Buildings
Casualty
Chaptered
Commerce
Corporations
Council Of State
Criminal Records
Disasters & Emergencies
Dmv
Education
Education Boards
Employment
For-profit
Global Transpark Authority
Health
Health Services
Hmos
Home Inspector Board
Housing
Inspections
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Liability
Licensing & Certification
Local Government
Long-term Care
Managed Care
Manufactured Homes
Motor Vehicle
Motor Vehicles
Nonprofit
Notification
Occupational Testing
Occupations
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Records
Reinsurance Facility Board
Religion & Religious Institutions
School Buildings
Special Economic Zones
Surety & Fidelity
Testing
Transportation Dept.