NC S490 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-23 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-23 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
License to Work
Title
License to Work
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-23 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-08-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/24/2021 |
2021-08-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-08-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-08-18 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-08-18 | House | Serial Referral To Transportation Stricken |
2021-08-17 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-17 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H570 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 24.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 28 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 28.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 7 | (n/a) | Citation Text |