NC S478 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Ch. SL 2015-116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Ch. SL 2015-116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
In-State Tuition For Certain Vets/Fed Prog
Title
In-State Tuition For Certain Vets/Fed Prog
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Ch. SL 2015-116 | |
2015-06-24 | Signed by Gov. 6/24/2015 | |
2015-06-23 | Pres. To Gov. 06/23/2015 | |
2015-06-23 | Ratified | |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2015 |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-06-18 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-18 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-06-18 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-06-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-06-17 | House | Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-06-17 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2015 |
2015-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - Universities |
2015-05-12 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Stricken |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Filed |