NC S473 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-23 - Ch. SL 2013-393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-23 - Ch. SL 2013-393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health Cost Transp/Speaker and PPT Standing
Title
Health Cost Transp/Speaker and PPT Standing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-07-26 - House - A1 Stam Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-07-26 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-07-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-26 - House - A1 Stam Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-07-26 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-07-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-23 | Ch. SL 2013-393 | |
2013-08-23 | Signed by Gov. 8/23/2013 | |
2013-07-26 | Pres. To Gov. 07/29/2013 | |
2013-07-26 | Ratified | |
2013-07-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-26 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2013-07-26 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-07-26 | Senate | Rec To Concur H Com Sub |
2013-07-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-07-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2013-07-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2013-07-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-07-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2013-07-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-07-25 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/25/2013 |
2013-07-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-07-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-07-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-07-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-07-22 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2013-05-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Health and Human Services, if favorable, Finance |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Filed |