NC S470 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Ch. SL 2022-51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Ch. SL 2022-51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
ABC Technical and Other Changes
Title
ABC Technical and Other Changes
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Johnson [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Paul Newton [R] | Sen. DeAndrea Salvador [D] |
Sen. Vickie Sawyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 106 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2021-11-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2021-11-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Ch. SL 2022-51 | |
2022-07-07 | Signed by Gov. 7/7/2022 | |
2022-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022 | |
2022-07-01 | Ratified | |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2022-06-30 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2022-06-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-30 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2022-06-29 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-11-18 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-11-18 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-11-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-18 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-11-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 11/18/2021 |
2021-11-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-11-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-11-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Alcoholic Beverage Control |
2021-11-17 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-09-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-09-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-09-29 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2021-07-06 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-07-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-06-16 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H624 (Same As) 2021-10-15 - Ch. SL 2021-166
Subjects
Abc Comn.
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Alcoholic Beverages
Aoc
Appointments
Attorney General
Banking Comn.
Banks
Beer & Wine
Chaptered
Commerce
Commissioner Of Banks
Commissions
Council Of State
Councils
Counties
Crimes
Distilleries
Emerging Technologies
Environment
Financial Institutions
Financial Services
Fire Marshall
General Assembly
Governor
Inmates
Innocence Inquiry Comn.
Innovation Council
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Investigations
Justice Dept.
Licenses & Permits
Liquor
Local Government
Lt. Governor
Manufacturing
Membership
Municipalities
Per Diem & Mileage
Presented
President Pro Tempore
Public Officials
Ratified
Recycling
Retailing
Salaries & Benefits
Secretary Of State
Session Laws
Solid Waste
Speaker
Title Change
Waste Management
Wineries & Breweries
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Alcoholic Beverages
Aoc
Appointments
Attorney General
Banking Comn.
Banks
Beer & Wine
Chaptered
Commerce
Commissioner Of Banks
Commissions
Council Of State
Councils
Counties
Crimes
Distilleries
Emerging Technologies
Environment
Financial Institutions
Financial Services
Fire Marshall
General Assembly
Governor
Inmates
Innocence Inquiry Comn.
Innovation Council
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Investigations
Justice Dept.
Licenses & Permits
Liquor
Local Government
Lt. Governor
Manufacturing
Membership
Municipalities
Per Diem & Mileage
Presented
President Pro Tempore
Public Officials
Ratified
Recycling
Retailing
Salaries & Benefits
Secretary Of State
Session Laws
Solid Waste
Speaker
Title Change
Waste Management
Wineries & Breweries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 63.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 250 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 21.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 1000 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 1001.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 1006 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 1006.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 101 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 1105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 1113.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 1114.7 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 1119 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 1122 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 603 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 809 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 904 | (n/a) | Citation Text |