NC S465 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on July 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-31 - Ch. SL 2009-388
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on July 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-31 - Ch. SL 2009-388
Summary
Amend State Fair Housing Act.
Title
Amend State Fair Housing Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-31 | Ch. SL 2009-388 | |
2009-07-31 | Signed By Gov. 7/31/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Pres. To Gov. 7/22/2009 | |
2009-07-21 | Ratified | |
2009-07-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-16 | Placed On Cal For 7/20/2009 | |
2009-07-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-07-01 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-09 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S465 |