NC S46 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Jacksonville Occupancy Tax
Title
Jacksonville Occupancy Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-09 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-06 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Filed |