NC S457 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article 13 of Business Corporation Act
Title
Amend Article 13 of Business Corporation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-347 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-21 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-04-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-18 | Placed On Cal For 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-18 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-04-16 | Placed On Cal For 4/18/2011 | |
2011-04-16 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-04-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-30 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-03-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-29 | Filed |