NC S455 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Ch. SL 2015-118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Ch. SL 2015-118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Iran Divestment Act
Title
Iran Divestment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Gunn [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] | Sen. Warren Daniel [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Sen. Thomas McInnis [R] | Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] | Sen. Daniel Soucek [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Ch. SL 2015-118 | |
2015-06-29 | Signed by Gov. 6/29/2015 | |
2015-06-25 | Pres. To Gov. 06/26/2015 | |
2015-06-25 | Ratified | |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2015 |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-06-18 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2015 |
2015-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2015-05-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-29 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Filed |