NC S444 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nonappropriated Capital Projects
Title
Nonappropriated Capital Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-164 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified | |
2012-06-27 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-26 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-26 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-25 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-18 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2012-06-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-18 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-18 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-14 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-14 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2012 | |
2012-06-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-29 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-03-29 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-28 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H904 (Same As) 2011-05-05 - Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Finance