NC S439 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend & Restate NC Limited Liability Co. Act
Title
Amend & Restate NC Limited Liability Co. Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Ch. SL 2013-157 | |
2013-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013 | |
2013-06-13 | Pres. To Gov. 06/14/2013 | |
2013-06-13 | Ratified | |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/12/2013 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Rec To Concur H Com Sub |
2013-06-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/07/2013 |
2013-06-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-30 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-25 | Engrossed | |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Filed |