NC S412 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Ch. SL 2009-247
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Ch. SL 2009-247
Summary
Modify NC Limited Liability Company Act.
Title
Modify NC Limited Liability Company Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Brown [R] | Sen. Peter Brunstetter [R] | Sen. Daniel Clodfelter [D] | Sen. Fletcher Hartsell [R] |
Sen. Richard Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Ch. SL 2009-247 | |
2009-07-01 | Signed By Gov. 7/1/2009 | |
2009-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2009 | |
2009-06-25 | Ratified | |
2009-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2009 | |
2009-06-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-10 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-06-10 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-05 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S412 |