NC S404 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

North Carolina First Step Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

North Carolina First Step Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-01SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-01SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-28SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback