NC S380 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
DHHS Block Grants
Title
DHHS Block Grants
Sponsors
Sen. Wilfred Wells [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Warren Daniel [R] | Sen. Vickie Sawyer [R] |
Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2020-07-07 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-07-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-07-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-07-07 | House | Added to Calendar |
2020-07-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-07-07 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2020-06-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2020-06-15 | House | Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-08-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2019-08-07 | House | Reptd Com Sub w/o Prejud |
2019-07-31 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2019-07-31 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary Added |
2019-07-31 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-07-30 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-02 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-01 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H532 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - Ch. SL 2019-20