NC S379 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Ch. SL 2020-29
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Ch. SL 2020-29
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement Systems Admin. Changes
Title
Retirement Systems Admin. Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Ch. SL 2020-29 | |
2020-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2020 | |
2020-06-11 | Pres. To Gov. 6/11/2020 | |
2020-06-10 | Ratified | |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/09/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2020-06-04 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-06-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/04/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2020-06-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-05-28 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-05-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-07 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Filed |