NC S355 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Government Transparency Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government Transparency Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2021-05-11SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2021-05-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/11/2021
2021-05-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2021-05-06SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/10/2021
2021-05-06SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-05SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-05SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-05-05SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-28SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-27SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-04-27SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-31SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-31SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-25SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S355
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S355v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S355v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S355v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S355v3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50650/0/S355-PCS15277-CE-17
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51311/0/S355-PCS15289-CE-20
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S355-SMCE-49(CSCE-17)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S355-SMCE-62(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S355-SMCE-67(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S355-SMCE-71(e3)-v-3

Bill Comments 750

feedback