NC S355 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Land-Use Regulatory Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land-Use Regulatory Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-06-26HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-25HousePlaced On Cal For 06/26/2019
2019-06-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-06-20HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-20HouseSerial Referral To Judiciary Stricken
2019-06-20HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-10HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
2019-06-10HouseSerial Referral To Judiciary Added
2019-06-10HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-06-06HouseRe-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-06HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-07SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-27SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H722 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback