NC S354 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Restore Funding/State Conservation Purposes
Title
Restore Funding/State Conservation Purposes
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Lee [R] | Sen. Deanna Ballard [R] | Sen. Michael Lazzara [R] | Sen. Ted Alexander [R] |
Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] | Sen. Kirk deViere [D] | Sen. Julie Mayfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H372 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Subjects
Agriculture
Budgeting
Clean Water Trust Fund
Conservation
Deeds
Environment
Excise
Farmland Preservation Fund
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Parks & Recreation Areas
Parks & Recreation Trust Fund
Property
Public
Real Estate
Revenue Dept.
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Taxes
Water Resources
Budgeting
Clean Water Trust Fund
Conservation
Deeds
Environment
Excise
Farmland Preservation Fund
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Parks & Recreation Areas
Parks & Recreation Trust Fund
Property
Public
Real Estate
Revenue Dept.
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Taxes
Water Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
105 | 228.30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
106 | 744 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 135.234 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 135.56 | (n/a) | Citation Text |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S354 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S354v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S354v1.pdf |