NC H372 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Restore Funding/State Conservation Purposes
Title
Restore Funding/State Conservation Purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2021-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-27 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2021-04-27 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Added |
2021-04-27 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-04-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-24 | House | Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S354 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Agriculture
Budgeting
Clean Water Trust Fund
Conservation
Deeds
Environment
Excise
Farmland Preservation Fund
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Parks & Recreation Areas
Parks & Recreation Trust Fund
Property
Public
Real Estate
Revenue Dept.
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Taxes
Water Resources
Budgeting
Clean Water Trust Fund
Conservation
Deeds
Environment
Excise
Farmland Preservation Fund
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Parks & Recreation Areas
Parks & Recreation Trust Fund
Property
Public
Real Estate
Revenue Dept.
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Taxes
Water Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
105 | 228.30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
106 | 744 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 215.73M | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 135.234 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 135.56 | (n/a) | Citation Text |