NC S349 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Housing Opportunities
Title
Increase Housing Opportunities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H401 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Economic Development
Housing
Infrastructure
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Property
Public
Urban Development
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Housing
Infrastructure
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Property
Public
Urban Development
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
160D | 102 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | 108 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | 1402 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | 702 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | 703 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | 703.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | 706 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | 707 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | 917 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
42A | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S349 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S349v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S349v1.pdf |