NC S344 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Common Area Entertainment ABC Permit
Title
Allow Common Area Entertainment ABC Permit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Filed |