NC S337 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Ch. SL 2013-355
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Ch. SL 2013-355
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
NC Charter School Advisory Board
Title
NC Charter School Advisory Board
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] | Sen. Daniel Soucek [R] | Sen. Warren Daniel [R] | Sen. Thomas Goolsby [R] |
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Eldon Newton [R] | Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-23 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-23 - House - C RPT Adopted (Y: 88 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-10 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 14 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-07-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - House - A2 Stam Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 88 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A1 Blackwell Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - Motion 12 - Move S337 to Rules Comm. (Y: 80 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - M12 Move S337 to Rules Comm. M4 Previous Question (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-23 - House - C RPT Adopted (Y: 88 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-10 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 14 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-07-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - House - A2 Stam Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 88 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A1 Blackwell Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - Motion 12 - Move S337 to Rules Comm. (Y: 80 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - M12 Move S337 to Rules Comm. M4 Previous Question (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | Ch. SL 2013-355 | |
2013-07-25 | Signed by Gov. 7/25/2013 | |
2013-07-25 | Pres. To Gov. 07/25/2013 | |
2013-07-24 | Ratified | |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2013-07-23 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2013-07-23 | House | Added to Calendar |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Conf Rept Withdrawn |
2013-07-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/24/2013 |
2013-07-23 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2013-07-23 | House | Conf Rpt Withdrawn |
2013-07-22 | House | Postponed To 07/23/2013 |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/23/2013 |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-18 | House | Postponed To 07/22/2013 |
2013-07-17 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/20/2013 |
2013-07-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-17 | House | Postponed To 07/18/2013 |
2013-07-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/17/2013 |
2013-07-16 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2013-07-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/17/2013 |
2013-07-16 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2013-07-10 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2013 |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Rec To Concur H Com Sub |
2013-07-08 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-07-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-08 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-06-27 | House | Postponed To 07/08/2013 |
2013-06-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-27 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013 |
2013-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2013-06-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-06-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-09 | House | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Appropriations |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-08 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-07 | Engrossed | |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Amend Failed A8 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Amend Failed A7 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Amend Failed A6 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Amend Adopted A5 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Amend Failed A4 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/07/2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Filed |