NC S336 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Ch. SL 2013-192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Ch. SL 2013-192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Collaboration Among State Diabetes Programs
Title
Collaboration Among State Diabetes Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Pate [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Ch. SL 2013-192 | |
2013-06-26 | Signed by Gov. 6/26/2013 | |
2013-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 06/20/2013 | |
2013-06-20 | Ratified | |
2013-06-19 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2013 |
2013-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-18 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2013-04-16 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-04-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-09 | House | Ref To Com On Health and Human Services |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-08 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On Health Care |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H571 (Same As) 2013-04-04 - Ref To Com On Health and Human Services