NC S333 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Ch. SL 2015-126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Ch. SL 2015-126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Teacher Transition Data
Title
Teacher Transition Data
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Ch. SL 2015-126 | |
2015-06-29 | Signed by Gov. 6/29/2015 | |
2015-06-25 | Pres. To Gov. 06/25/2015 | |
2015-06-24 | Ratified | |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-06-18 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2015 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2015-06-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/18/2015 |
2015-06-17 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2015-06-09 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/09/2015 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/08/2015 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-06-04 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/03/2015 |
2015-06-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-29 | House | Ref To Com On Education - K-12 |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-27 | Engrossed | |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/27/2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Filed |