NC S317 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Hypertension Awareness Day
Title
Hypertension Awareness Day
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Louis Pate [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Erica Smith-Ingram [D] |
Sen. Joyce Waddell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H411 (Same As) 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate