NC S314 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Durham County Water/Wastewater Plant Projects
Title
Durham County Water/Wastewater Plant Projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed |