NC S309 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conservation Easements Stewardship Funds
Title
Conservation Easements Stewardship Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-209 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-07 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-02 | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2011-06-02 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-10 | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2011-03-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |