NC S308 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
0.00 Alcohol Restriction-All DWI
Title
0.00 Alcohol Restriction-All DWI
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H31 (Same As) 2015-05-05 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I