NC S305 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Ch. SL 2013-372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Ch. SL 2013-372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DMV Commission Contract Changes
Title
DMV Commission Contract Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-18 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-07-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-07-18 - House - A4 Speciale Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-07-18 - House - A3 Stevens Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2013-07-18 - House - A2 Elmore Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 65 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2013-07-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-07-17 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-07-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-07-18 - House - A4 Speciale Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-07-18 - House - A3 Stevens Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2013-07-18 - House - A2 Elmore Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 65 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2013-07-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-07-17 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-29 | Ch. SL 2013-372 | |
2013-07-29 | Signed by Gov. 7/29/2013 | |
2013-07-23 | Pres. To Gov. 07/23/2013 | |
2013-07-22 | Ratified | |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Concurred In H Amend S305v4 |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Rec To Concur In H Amend |
2013-07-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-18 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2013-07-18 | House | Amend Failed A3 |
2013-07-18 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2013-07-18 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A1 |
2013-07-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/17/2013 |
2013-07-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-07-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-20 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-06-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-06-20 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Com Amend Adpt & Engross 1 |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav As Amended |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed |