NC S287 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extend Small Business Center Incubator Period
Title
Extend Small Business Center Incubator Period
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-331 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-29 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2011-03-29 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-10 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2011-03-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |