NC S286 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Ch. SL 2023-22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Ch. SL 2023-22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Make Pamlico Bd. of Ed. Elect. Partisan
Title
Make Pamlico Bd. of Ed. Elect. Partisan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Ch. SL 2023-22 | |
2023-05-25 | Ratified | |
2023-05-24 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/24/2023 |
2023-05-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-06 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-05 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Chaptered
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Membership
Pamlico County
Political Parties
Presented
Ratified
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Chaptered
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Membership
Pamlico County
Political Parties
Presented
Ratified
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 37.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |