NC S270 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Ch. SL 2021-177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance Technical Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Technical Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-02 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-10 Ch. SL 2021-177
2021-11-10 Signed by Gov. 11/10/2021
2021-11-04 Pres. To Gov. 11/4/2021
2021-11-03 Ratified
2021-11-02SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-11-02SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2021-11-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 11/02/2021
2021-11-01SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-10-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-10-25SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2021-10-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-10-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-10-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-10-20HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-10-20HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-10-20HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-03HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-03HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-03HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-04-29SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-04-28SenateEngrossed
2021-04-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-28SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-04-27SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-22SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-22SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-04-22SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-25SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-25SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-15SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-15SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-11SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
58(n/a)Citation Text
582-164(n/a)Citation Text
583-149(n/a)Citation Text
583-150(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S270
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v6.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50545/0/S270-PCS15273-BB-6
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50819/0/S270-ABH-11-V-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/53204/0/S270-PCS15338-TU-23
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S270-SMBH-17(e1)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S270-SMBH-18(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S270-SMTU-77(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S270-SMTU-78(e4)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/122
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/121
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/547
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/487

Bill Comments

feedback