NC S269 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Ch. SL 2022-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Ch. SL 2022-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Washington-Warren Airport Authority
Title
Washington-Warren Airport Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | Ch. SL 2022-34 | |
2022-07-01 | Ratified | |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2022 |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2022-06-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-30 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2022-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-30 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2022-06-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-06-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H387 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Airport Authorities
Airports
Appointments
Authorities
Aviation
Beaufort County
Cary
Chaptered
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Durham
Durham County
Elections
Local
Local Government
Membership
Municipalities
Public Officials
Ratified
Session Laws
Title Change
Vacancies
Wake County
Washington
Washington County
Airports
Appointments
Authorities
Aviation
Beaufort County
Cary
Chaptered
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Durham
Durham County
Elections
Local
Local Government
Membership
Municipalities
Public Officials
Ratified
Session Laws
Title Change
Vacancies
Wake County
Washington
Washington County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40A | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text |