NC S263 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Ch. SL 2011-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Ch. SL 2011-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
ETJ/Wake Municipal Farm Exemption
Title
ETJ/Wake Municipal Farm Exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Blue [D] | Sen. Neal Hunt [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Ch. SL 2011-34 | |
2011-04-12 | Ratified | |
2011-04-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-07 | Placed On Cal For 4/11/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-21 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-03-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-09 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2011-03-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |