NC S257 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on September 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-20 - Ch. SL 2021-161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on September 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-20 - Ch. SL 2021-161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Medication Cost Transparency Act
Title
Medication Cost Transparency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-08-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-08-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-20 | Ch. SL 2021-161 | |
2021-09-20 | Signed by Gov. 9/20/2021 | |
2021-09-10 | Pres. To Gov. 9/10/2021 | |
2021-09-09 | Ratified | |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-09-08 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2021-09-08 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-09-08 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2021-08-19 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-08-19 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-08-18 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-08-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-18 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-08-18 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-08-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-08-18 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-08-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-07-26 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2021-06-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2021-06-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-06-03 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-06-03 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Commerce
Consumer Protection
Definitions
Health
Health Services
Insurance
Occupations
Patient Rights
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists & Pharmacies
Presented
Public
Ratified
Commerce
Consumer Protection
Definitions
Health
Health Services
Insurance
Occupations
Patient Rights
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists & Pharmacies
Presented
Public
Ratified
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
58 | 2-40 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 51-37 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56-2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-21 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-25 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-45 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 56A-50 | (n/a) | Citation Text |