NC S256 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Ch. SL 2022-10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Ch. SL 2022-10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Rockingham Community College BOT
Title
Rockingham Community College BOT
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Jarvis [R] | Sen. Michael Lazzara [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] | Sen. Jim Burgin [R] |
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Todd Johnson [R] | Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 61 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 61 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Ch. SL 2022-10 | |
2022-06-15 | Ratified | |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/14/2022 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2022-06-08 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-08 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-08 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-06-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-24 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Boards
Cabarrus County
Chaptered
Community College Boards
Community Colleges
Council Of State
Counties
Davidson County
Davie County
Education
Forsyth County
General Assembly
Governor
Johnston County
Jones County
Local
Membership
Minors
Montgomery County
Nash County
President Pro Tempore
Public Officials
Ratified
Rockingham County
Rowan County
Secondary Education
Speaker
Sports
Stanly County
Student Athletes
Students
Title Change
Boards
Cabarrus County
Chaptered
Community College Boards
Community Colleges
Council Of State
Counties
Davidson County
Davie County
Education
Forsyth County
General Assembly
Governor
Johnston County
Jones County
Local
Membership
Minors
Montgomery County
Nash County
President Pro Tempore
Public Officials
Ratified
Rockingham County
Rowan County
Secondary Education
Speaker
Sports
Stanly County
Student Athletes
Students
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115D | 12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 122 | (n/a) | Citation Text |