NC S24 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Ch. SL 2017-18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Ch. SL 2017-18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allow Restaurants to Use Outdoor Grills
Title
Allow Restaurants to Use Outdoor Grills
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McInnis [R] | Sen. Jeffery Tarte [R] | Sen. James Davis [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] |
Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Ch. SL 2017-18 | |
2017-05-24 | Signed by Gov. 5/24/2017 | |
2017-05-23 | Pres. To Gov. 5/23/2017 | |
2017-05-22 | Ratified | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/18/2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2017-05-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/11/2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform |
2017-05-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-10 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed |