NC S236 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-26 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-26 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sup. Ct. Judge Can Perform Marriage
Title
Sup. Ct. Judge Can Perform Marriage
Sponsors
Sen. Neal Hunt [R] | Sen. Thomas Apodaca [R] | Sen. Peter Brunstetter [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] | Sen. Jeffery Tarte [R] | Sen. Wyatt Tucker [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 12 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-07-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - House - Re-Refer SB 236 M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Oper. House (Y: 71 N: 34 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - House - Re-Refer SB 236 to Rules Comm. M4 Previous Question (Y: 83 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - House - Re-Refer SB236 to Rules Comm. M3 To Lay On The Table (Y: 34 N: 71 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - House - Re-Refer SB 236 M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Oper. House (Y: 71 N: 34 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - House - Re-Refer SB 236 to Rules Comm. M4 Previous Question (Y: 83 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - House - Re-Refer SB236 to Rules Comm. M3 To Lay On The Table (Y: 34 N: 71 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-26 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2013-07-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/25/2013 |
2013-07-24 | Senate | Rec To Concur H Com Sub |
2013-07-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-24 | House | Added to Calendar |
2013-07-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-07-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-07-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-07-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-07-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Government |
2013-07-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-20 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-16 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-15 | Engrossed | |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |