NC S233 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Redistricting and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Redistricting and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Alexander Co. Bd. of Ed. Referendum
Title
Alexander Co. Bd. of Ed. Referendum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H308 (Same As) 2023-06-14 - Ch. SL 2023-41
Subjects
Alexander County
Boards
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Membership
Political Parties
Secondary Education
Boards
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Membership
Political Parties
Secondary Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 37.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2023/S233 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/Senate/PDF/S233v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/Senate/PDF/S233v1.pdf |