NC S228 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Ch. SL 2021-151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Ch. SL 2021-151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Employers to Offer EPO Benefit Plans
Title
Allow Employers to Offer EPO Benefit Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-10 | Ch. SL 2021-151 | |
2021-09-10 | Signed by Gov. 9/10/2021 | |
2021-08-31 | Pres. To Gov. 8/31/2021 | |
2021-08-30 | Ratified | |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/26/2021 |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-08-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-08-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-24 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-08-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-08-24 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-08-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2021-08-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-08-04 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-04 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-10 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H373 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Chaptered
Commerce
Corporations
Employment
For-profit
Health
Health Services
Insurance
Insurance Dept.
Personnel
Presented
Public
Ratified
Salaries & Benefits
Small Business
Commerce
Corporations
Employment
For-profit
Health
Health Services
Insurance
Insurance Dept.
Personnel
Presented
Public
Ratified
Salaries & Benefits
Small Business
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
58 | 50-56.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 50-56.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |