NC S228 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Ch. SL 2013-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Ch. SL 2013-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
HOAs/Lim. Com. Elements/Amend of Declaration
Title
HOAs/Lim. Com. Elements/Amend of Declaration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Ch. SL 2013-34 | |
2013-04-24 | Signed by Gov. 4/24/2013 | |
2013-04-16 | Pres. To Gov. 04/16/2013 | |
2013-04-15 | Ratified | |
2013-04-11 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/11/2013 |
2013-04-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-01 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A |
2013-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-28 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |