NC S219 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Ch. SL 2022-1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Ch. SL 2022-1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Surveyor Lic.& Ed.Req's/Constr.Contract Rev's
Title
Surveyor Lic.& Ed.Req's/Constr.Contract Rev's
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-11-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-11-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-11-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Ch. SL 2022-1 | |
2022-01-26 | Signed by Gov. 1/26/2022 | |
2022-01-19 | Pres. To Gov. 1/19/2022 | |
2022-01-19 | Ratified | |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-01-19 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2022-01-19 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-01-19 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2021-12-06 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2021-11-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 11/29/2021 |
2021-11-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-11-18 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-11-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-17 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-11-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-11-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/11/2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Apprenticeships
Beer & Wine
Boards
Chaptered
Civil Actions
Commerce
Construction
Contracts
Courts
Debtor & Creditor
Education
Employment
Engineers & Engineering
Engineers & Surveyors Board
Licensing & Certification
Liens
Occupational Testing
Occupations
Presented
Professional Education
Public
Ratified
Surveyors & Surveying
Testing
Apprenticeships
Beer & Wine
Boards
Chaptered
Civil Actions
Commerce
Construction
Contracts
Courts
Debtor & Creditor
Education
Employment
Engineers & Engineering
Engineers & Surveyors Board
Licensing & Certification
Liens
Occupational Testing
Occupations
Presented
Professional Education
Public
Ratified
Surveyors & Surveying
Testing
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143 | 128.1A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 128.1B | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 1119 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
22B | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
44A | 35 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
89C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
89C | 10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
89C | 11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
89C | 13 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
89C | 17 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
89C | 22 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
89C | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text |