NC S205 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Ch. Res 2017-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Ch. Res 2017-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution to Allow SAV Oyster Leasing
Title
Resolution to Allow SAV Oyster Leasing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Ch. Res 2017-10 |
2017-06-27 | Ratified | |
2017-06-26 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Environment |
2017-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-26 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Filed |