NC S203 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Ch. SL 2023-20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Ch. SL 2023-20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize Skateboard Restrictions/Polk Co
Title
Authorize Skateboard Restrictions/Polk Co
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Ch. SL 2023-20 | |
2023-05-25 | Ratified | |
2023-05-24 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/24/2023 |
2023-05-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-25 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-24 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Local
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Ratified
Recreation & Leisure
Roads & Highways
Sports
Transportation
Local
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Ratified
Recreation & Leisure
Roads & Highways
Sports
Transportation