NC S20 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Ch. SL 2015-2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Ch. SL 2015-2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
IRC Update/Motor Fuel Tax Changes
Title
IRC Update/Motor Fuel Tax Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 79 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 69 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 4 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - A3 Hamilton Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - A2 Jones Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - A1 Catlin Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Amendment 3 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 69 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 4 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - A3 Hamilton Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - A2 Jones Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - A1 Catlin Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Amendment 3 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Ch. SL 2015-2 | |
2015-03-31 | Signed by Gov. 3/31/2015 | |
2015-03-31 | Pres. To Gov. 03/31/2015 | |
2015-03-31 | Ratified | |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-03-31 | House | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2015-03-30 | House | Conf Report Adopted 2nd |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted 2nd |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/30/2015 |
2015-03-26 | House | Ruled Material |
2015-03-26 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Conf Held As Material |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2015-03-11 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-03-05 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2015-03-04 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-03-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/04/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-03-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-02-18 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Added |
2015-02-18 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-02-12 | Engrossed | |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amend Tabled A3 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H40 (Same As) 2015-02-04 - Ref To Com On Finance